This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/13/2022 at 20:36:58 (UTC).

CERTIFIED TIRE & SERVICE CENTERS WAGE & HOUR CASES

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 CERTIFIED TIRE SERVICE CENTERS WAGE HOUR CASES was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0313

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Oscar Gutierrez

Michael Rehse

Pascal Jeandebien

The class members

Defendants and Respondents

Certified Tire and Service Centers, Inc.

Barrett Business Services, Inc.

Other

Judicial Council

Not Yet Classified

California Retailers Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregg Lander

Jeremy A. Graham

Matthew Righetti

John Glugoski

Kevin T. Barnes

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Timothy Mark Freudenberger

Garrett Voorhees Jensen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition denied; CA opinion decertified

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; CA opinion decertified; Notes: The petition for review is denied. On the court's own motion, the Reporter of Decisions is directed not to publish in the Official Appellate Reports the opinion in the above-entitled appeal filed July 2, 2021, which appears at 66 Cal.App.5th 190. (Cal. Const., art. VI, section 14; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1125.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 8, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2021

DocketDescription: Filing fee; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Certified Tire and Service Centers, Inc. Attorney: Garrett Voorhees Jensen Filing fee of $390 for the answer to petition for review.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2021

DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Certified Tire and Service Centers, Inc. Attorney: Garrett Voorhees Jensen Defendant and Respondent: Barrett Business Services, Inc. Attorney: Garrett Voorhees Jensen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Oscar Gutierrez Attorney: Kevin T. Barnes Plaintiff and Appellant: Michael Rehse Attorney: Kevin T. Barnes Plaintiff and Appellant: Pascal Jeandebien Attorney: Kevin T. Barnes Plaintiff and Appellant: The class members Attorney: Kevin T. Barnes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D072265; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Riverside County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1307773; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2013-00038110-CU-OE-CTL; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP4762

[+] Read More [-] Read Less