This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2023 at 09:05:24 (UTC).

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON v. CONAGRA GROCERY PRODUCTS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CONAGRA GROCERY PRODUCTS COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4797

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Century Indemnity Company

Travelers Casualty and Surety Co.

Affiliated FM Insurance Company

American Zurich Insurance Company

TIG Insurance Company, as successor to International Insurance Company

Arrowood Indemnity Company

Safety National Casualty Company

Great American E&S Insurance Company

Munich Reinsurance America Inc.

Executive Risk Indemnity Inc.

Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company

First State Insurance Company

Granite State Insurance Company

The Continental Insurance Company

Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Everest Reinsurance Company

Appellants and Defendants

ConAgra Grocery Products Co., LLC

ConAgra Grocery Products Company

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara M. Thorpe

Attorney at Nicolaides Fink Thorpe Michaelides Sullivan LLP

101 Montgomery Street, Suite 2300

San Francisco, CA 94104

Alicia Shelton

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

100 East Pratt Street, Suite 2440

Baltimore, MD 21202-1031

Carl S. Kravitz

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street Nw Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036-5807

Caroline E. Reynolds

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

1800 M Street Nw Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036-5807

Ryan Westerfield

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

200 Campus Drive, Suite 300

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Paul R. Koepff

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

The Chrysler Building 405 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10174

Peter J. Whalen

Attorney at Clyde & Co. U.S. LLP

150 California Street, 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jonathan D. Hacker

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, N. W.

Washington, DC 20006

Stephen P. Blake

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Susannah S. Geltman

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

475 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 1001

Bryce L. Friedman

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

475 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

John E. Delascio

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Scott Seaman

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Robert G. Levy

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

One California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Debra R. Puebla

Attorney at Sinnott Puebla Campagne & Curet APLC

550 South Hope Street, Suite 2350

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Robert Allan Sanders

Attorney at Sinnott Puebla Campagne & Curet, APLC

515 South Figueroa Street, Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2618

James Henry Kallianis

Attorney at Skarzynski Marick & Black LLP

353 North Clark Street, Suite 3650

Chicago, IL 60654-4726

Mark D. Plevin

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Laura A. Foggan

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw

Washington, DC 20004

27 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed; Notes: The order filed on July 20, 2022 is hereby amended in its entirety as follows: The requests to appear as counsel pro hac vice are granted. The petition for review is denied. Corrigan, J., was recused and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The request to appear as counsel pro hac vice is granted. The petition for review is denied. Corrigan, J., was recused and did not participate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: by Charles Scibetta, requesting permission to appear pro hac vice for respondents, AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company, and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: by Theodore Debonis, requesting permission to appear pro hac vice for respondents, AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, Lexington Insurance Company, and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note: Mail returned (unable to forward); Notes: Mail return to sender, not deliverable as addressed unable to forward.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: ConAgra Grocery Products Company Attorney: Raymond A. Cardozo Defendant and Appellant: ConAgra Grocery Products Co., LLC Attorney: Raymond A. Cardozo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Attorney: Ethan H. Seibert Plaintiff and Respondent: Century Indemnity Company Attorney: W. Andrew Miller Plaintiff and Respondent: Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. Attorney: Stephen P. Blake Plaintiff and Respondent: Affiliated FM Insurance Company Attorney: Robert G. Levy Plaintiff and Respondent: American Zurich Insurance Company Attorney: James Henry Kallianis Plaintiff and Respondent: Arrowood Indemnity Company Attorney: Bruce D. Celebrezze Plaintiff and Respondent: Safety National Casualty Company Attorney: Philip R. Matthews Plaintiff and Respondent: Great American E&S Insurance Company Attorney: William J. Baron Plaintiff and Respondent: Munich Reinsurance America Inc. Attorney: Bruce H. Winkelman Plaintiff and Respondent: Executive Risk Indemnity Inc. Attorney: Bruce H. Winkelman Plaintiff and Respondent: Allianz Underwriters Insurance Company Attorney: Mary E. McPherson Plaintiff and Respondent: First State Insurance Company Attorney: Alan J. Weil Plaintiff and Respondent: Certain London Market Insurance Companies Attorney: Edward P. Murphy Plaintiff and Respondent: Granite State Insurance Company Attorney: Gary R. Selvin Plaintiff and Respondent: The Continental Insurance Company Attorney: Julia Martinescu Beckley Plaintiff and Respondent: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau Attorney: Faisal M Zubairi Plaintiff and Respondent: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company Attorney: Mary E. McPherson Plaintiff and Respondent: Everest Reinsurance Company Attorney: Mark D. Plevin Plaintiff and Respondent: Old Republic Insurance Company Attorney: Brandt L. Wolkin Answer to petition for review filed. Due on 06/24/2022 By 2 Day(s) * ET AL.*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of respondents Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the answer to petition for review is extended to 12:00 p.m. Friday, June 24, 2022. The reply to answer to petition for review is to be filed by Tuesday, July 5, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: by Ethan H. Seibert, counsel for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, requesting an extension to July 1, 2022 to file the answer to petition for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: by Carl S. Kravitz, requesting permission to appear pro hac vice for respondents, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: ConAgra Grocery Products Company Attorney: Raymond A. Cardozo Defendant and Appellant: ConAgra Grocery Products Co., LLC Attorney: Raymond A. Cardozo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A160548; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CGC14536731

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less