This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/29/2022 at 02:23:58 (UTC).

Central Coast Community Energy and City of San Jose et al. v. Public Utilities Commission of the State of California

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Central Coast Community Energy and City of San Jose filed an Other lawsuit against Public Utilities Commission of the State of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0016

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Central Coast Community Energy and City of San Jose

Administrator of San Jose Clean Energy

Respondent

Public Utilities Commission of the State of California

Interested Parties

Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Southern California Edison Company

San Diego Gas & Electric Company

Coalition of California Utility Employees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Megan Joy Somogyi

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

455 Market Street Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94105-3133

Thomas Jamison MacBride, Jr

Attorney at Downey Brand LLP

455 Market Street Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94105

Respondent Attorneys

Monica Lynn McCrary

Attorney at California Public Utilities Commission

505 Van Ness Ave #5134

San Francisco, CA 94102

Christine Jun Hammond

Attorney at California Public Utilities Commission

505 Van Ness Ave

San Francisco, CA 94102

Dale Alison Holzschuh

Attorney at CPUC/Legal Div

505 Van Ness Ave 5Fl

San Francisco, CA 94102

Interested Party Attorney

Rachael Eve Koss

Attorney at Adams Broadwell Joseph & Cardozo

601 Gateway Blvd #1000

South San Francisco, CA 94080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Any reply by the petitioner shall be due by October 10, 2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Answer to petition filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: Answer of the coalition of California Utility Employees to petition for writ of review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service for corrected petition and exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: 3 volumes of corrected exhibits with pagination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of review filed (PUC); Notes: Corrected petition with pagination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Answer to petition filed by:. Due on 08/15/2022 By 61 Day(s) To file an answer to the petition for writ of review, and to file a reply to the answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Answer to petition filed by:. Requested for 08/15/2022 By 61 Day(s) The parties agree to a 60-day extension of time to file any answer and a 30-day extension of time to file any reply.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: showing service on parties of the petition for writ of review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Exhibits - Corrections needed: pagination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of review filed (PUC)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Public Utilities Commison of The State of California is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant