This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/01/2021 at 01:47:45 (UTC).

Celsius Holdings, Inc. v. Superior Court Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Celsius Holdings, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Freeman, Kenneth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5614

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Freeman, Kenneth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Celsius Holdings, INC.,

Celsius Holdings, Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Daniel Prescod

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jonah Adam Grossbardt

Attorney at SRIPLAW, P.A.

8730 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 350

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2313

Matthew Laurence Rollin

Attorney at SRIPLAW

8730 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 350

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Respondent Attorneys

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

N. Christina Mirzaie

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm PC

22525 Pacific Coast Highway

Malibu, CA 90265

Ryan Jack Clarkson

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm

9255 Sunset Blvd. Suite 804

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Zachary Tyler Chrzan

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm

9255 Sunset Blvd Ste 804

Los Angeles, CA 90069

Bahar Sodaify

Attorney at Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.

9255 W Sunset Blvd Ste 804

West Hollywood, CA 90069-3305

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Daniel Prescod Attorney: Ryan Jack Clarkson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Daniel PrescodAttorney: Ryan Jack Clarkson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Petitioner: Celsius Holdings, Inc. Attorney: Jonah Adam Grossbardt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner: Celsius Holdings, Inc.Attorney: Jonah Adam Grossbardt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Court Counsel, Los Angeles Superior Court, dated November 15, 2021. "...the Superior Court will not be filing briefing on the question presented."

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: counsel. On or before November 18, 2021, the parties are requested to file letter briefs, not to exceed five pages in length, addressing the timeliness of the petition pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, section 437c, subdivision (m)(1) ["[t]he superior court may, for good cause, and before the expiration of the initial period, extend the time for one additional period not to exceed 10 days."]. The briefs may be filed electronically via the court's e-filing service provider (TrueFiling).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 4 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 3 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 2 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Filed Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CELSIUS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRZAN ZACHARY TYLER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SODAIFY BAHAR