This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/17/2023 at 13:01:59 (UTC).

C.C. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 C C filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6682

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Petitioner

C. C.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

S. D.

M. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Hannah Johl

Tracy Marie De Soto

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Richard Thomas Swanson

Anna Jo Curry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for extraordinary writ relief with request for stay is denied on the merits. (See Joyce G. v. Superior Court (1995) 38 Cal.App.4th 1501, 1513-1514.) ROBIE, Acting P.J.; HULL, J.; BOULWARE EURIE, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service; Notes: for response by RPI Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency. Supplemental, showing service on counsel for RPI S.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: by RPI Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency to petition for extraordinary writ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ petition filed.; Notes: Stay requested.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Petitioner's request for an extension of time to file a petition for extraordinary writ is granted in part. The petition for extraordinary writ is to be served and filed by September 12, 2022. The request is otherwise denied. ROBIE, Acting P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Petitioner requesting to 09/16/22 to file petition for extraordinary writ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed scheduling order.; Notes: Petition due 09/06/22. Preliminary response due 10 Days (PS), or 15 Days (MS/ES) thereafter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: 4 vols. CT (1,075 pp.); 2 vols. RT (475 pp.).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Petitioner C.C. associating attorney Tracy De Soto as counsel of record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court 07/27/22. Record due: 08/16/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less