This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/21/2021 at 22:51:11 (UTC).

Cato v. Allied University Security Services

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Cato filed an Other lawsuit against Allied University Security Services. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9262

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Kendra Cato

Respondent and Defendant

Allied University Security Services

Not Yet Classified

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Alistair Segal

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

9665 Wilshire Blvd Suite 430

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Law Offfices of Shaun Setareh

315 South Beverly Dr., Ste 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-4309

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Jeremy Taylor Naftel

Attorney at Martenson, Hasbrouck & Simon LLP

455 Capitol Mall Ste 601

Sacramento, CA 95814-4439

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 11/17/2021 By 50 Day(s) 1st

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's extension request missing the requested date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.100(b)(2). Filed 8/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Shaun Setareh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: We have received a copy of the notice of election to proceed under the provisions of rule 8.124 of the California Rules of Court. The appellant having filed notice of intent to proceed without a reporter's transcript on appeal, the appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be served and filed within 70 days from the date of filing the notice of election under rule 8.124 with the trial court (rule 8.212(a)(1)(B) of the California Rules of Court).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Filed 7/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Kendra Cato, Filed 7/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV363845

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases where Allied Universal Security Services LLC is a litigant