This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/02/2023 at 08:03:34 (UTC).

Castellanos et al. v. State of California et al.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 Castellanos filed an Other lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Roesch, Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3655

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Roesch, Frank

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

Hector Castellanos

Joseph Delgado

Saori Okawa

Michael Robinson

Service Employees International Union California State Council

Service Employees International Union

Appellants and Defendants

State of California

Katie Hagen

Protect App-Based Drivers and Services

Davis White

Keith Yandell

Appellants and Intervenors

Protect App-Based Drivers and Services

Davis White

Keith Yandell

Amicus Curiae

California Chamber of Commerce (CalChamber)

Communities-of-Color Organizations

Gig Workers Rising

Mobile Workers Alliance

Rideshare Drivers United-California

We Drive Progress, et al.

California Election Law Professors

California Constitution Center

Labor Law Professors

29 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorneys

Richard Raziel Rios

Stacey Monica Leyton

Robin B. Johansen

Deborah Barthel Caplan

Benjamin N. Gevercer

Stephen Berzon

Scott A. Kronland

James Baltzer

Nicole Gina Berner

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda

Jeffrey Louis Fisher

Sean P. Welch

David J. Lazarus

Kurt Ryan Oneto

Arthur George Scotland

Appellant and Intervenor Attorneys

Jeffrey Louis Fisher

Sean P. Welch

David J. Lazarus

Kurt Ryan Oneto

Arthur George Scotland

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Kenneth Michael Trujillo-Jamison

Benjamin Steed Beach

Nayantara Mehta

Hina Bhagwan Shah

Richard Leslie Hasen

42 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

A163655

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

05/15/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DispositionDescription: Affirmed/part, rev/part, remanded w/direction; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Brown, Tracie L.; Participants: Streeter, Jon B. (Dissent) Pollak, Stuart R. (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published)The judgment is affirmed to the extent it declared sections 7465(c)(3) and (c)(4) invalid and to the extent the trial court retained jurisdiction to consider a motion for attorney fees under Code of Civil Procedure section 1021.5. In all other respects, the judgment is reversed. The matter is remanded to the trial court with instructions to enter a new judgment not inconsistent with this opinion. All parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. Streeter concurring and dissenting;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Scott A. Kronland will present oral argument for Respondents Hector Castellanos et al. In addition, six other attorneys and seven party representatives, listed below, plan to attend the December 13, 2022 hearing in person. Stephen P. Berzon Stacey M. Leyton Juhyung Harold Lee Robin S. Tholin Deborah Caplan Keith Pershall

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Jeffrey L. Fisher of O'Melveny & Myers LLP will appear in person to present argument on behalf of Intervenors and Appellants Protect App-Based Drivers and Services, Davis White, and Keith Yandell. Three additional attorneys for Intervenors and Appellants intend to attend the hearing in person.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Benjamin S. Beach; dated 12.5.22; attys H. Shah, N. Mehta, B. Chen, & B. Beach not appearing at OA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Alex Vogel; dated 12.5.22; Joy Rosenquist will appear to observe OA;

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: from counsel for a/c CA Election Law Professors; no counsel will appear in person to observe OA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
117 More Docket Entries
10/15/2021

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Intervener and Appellant: Protect App-Based Drivers and Services Attorney: Sean P. Welch (judgment attached)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Katie HagenAttorney: Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda; Notes: (order attached)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2021

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Intervener and Appellant: Protect App-Based Drivers and ServicesAttorney: Sean P. Welch; Notes: (judgment attached)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by Protect App-Bases Drivers and Services, et al via credit card

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: As to appeal filed 9-22-21 by Protect App-Bases Drivers and Services, et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 9-22-21 by counsel for Intervenors Protect App-Based Drivers and Services, et al. from judgment of 9-13-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: As to appeal filed by State of California 9-21-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 9-21-21 by counsel for respondent State of California, et al. from judgment of 9-13-21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG21088725; Trial Court Judge: Roesch, Frank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less