This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/30/2023 at 01:58:17 (UTC).

The People v. Madrigal

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Madrigal. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jurado, Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8207

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jurado, Ray

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Joaquin Madrigal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

California Appellate Project

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2023

HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Joaquin Madrigal Attorney: California Appellate Project One extension granted for a total of 31 days: 10/26/2023 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 11/27/2023 By 31 Day(s) 10/26/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 11/27/2023 By 31 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 12/21/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Joaquin MadrigalAttorney: California Appellate Project; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 31 days: 10/26/2023 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 11/27/2023 By 31 Day(s) 10/26/2023 Granted - extension of time. Due on 11/27/2023 By 31 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: in re omission letter dated 7.25.2023AOB+30Reporter's Transcript-1 Marsden Transcripts-2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: SCLA Crim Appeals in re omission letter dated 7.25.2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketDescription: Suspend briefing.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Joaquin Madrigal Attorney: California Appellate Project

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Appellant, July 25, 2023, RT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketBrief: Suspend briefing.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Joaquin MadrigalAttorney: California Appellate Project

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: California Appellate Project appointed counsel for Appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcript-1 (186 pgs) Reporter's Transcript-1 Probation Report-1 *Notice sent 05/09/2023*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: NOA filed January 12, 2023 - - Joaquin Madrigal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BA482074; Trial Court Judge: Jurado, Ray

[+] Read More [-] Read Less