This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/04/2023 at 01:34:26 (UTC).

Rigg et al. v. Childers

Case Summary

On 03/28/2023 Rigg filed an Other lawsuit against Childers. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderholt, L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1930

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Anderholt, L.

 

Party Details

Appellant

Deborah Childers

Respondents

Aleta Nancy Rigg

Loretta Ann Catania

Michelle Mildred Black

Randall Grant Copp

Amicus Curiae

Norma A. Hampton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Christopher Michael Lenz

Randall Alan Cohen

Paul Allan Lenz

Respondent Attorneys

Mitchell A. Driskill

Douglas Anthony Dube

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Kristen Anne Friedman

David Gerald Greco

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/04/2023

HearingDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Respondent: Aleta Nancy Rigg Attorney: Mitchell A. Driskill Respondent: Loretta Ann Catania Attorney: Mitchell A. Driskill Respondent: Michelle Mildred Black Attorney: Mitchell A. Driskill Respondent: Randall Grant Copp Attorney: Mitchell A. Driskill

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Respondent: Aleta Nancy RiggAttorney: Mitchell A. Driskill Respondent: Loretta Ann CataniaAttorney: Mitchell A. Driskill Respondent: Michelle Mildred BlackAttorney: Mitchell A. Driskill Respondent: Randall Grant CoppAttorney: Mitchell A. Driskill

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Appellant: Deborah Childers Attorney: Randall Alan Cohen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2023

DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Deborah ChildersAttorney: Randall Alan Cohen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Appellant: Deborah Childers Attorney: Randall Alan Cohen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketBrief: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Appellant: Deborah ChildersAttorney: Randall Alan Cohen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Chhokar Law Group, P.C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketDescription: Order granting motion to file amicus curiae brief.; Notes: The application of Norma A. Hampton to file an amicus curiae brief on behalf of respondents is GRANTED. The amicus curiae brief is deemed filed as of the date of this order. Any party to this appeal shall have 20 calendar days to file an answer to the amicus curiae brief. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.200(c)(6).) Norma A. Hampton's request for judicial notice, filed October 23, 2023, will be considered concurrently with the appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The appellate record in this case does not contain a reporter's transcript, settled statement, or other adequate statement of the evidence admitted at trial. "In numerous situations, appellate courts have refused to reach the merits of an appellant's claims because no reporter's transcript of a pertinent proceeding or a suitable substitute was provided." (Foust v. San Jose Construction Co., Inc. (2011) 198 Cal.App.4th 181, 186.) In cases where live testimony was presented, in particular, a lack of reporter's transcript or suitable substitute may hinder the court's ability to undertake a meaningful review of the arguments on appeal. The court accordingly requests the parties to submit supplemental briefing addressing whether any or all of the issues Ms. Childers raises on appeal must be resolved against her due to the failure to provide an adequate record. The letter briefs are due within 21 days of the date of this order and shall not exceed 2,000 words each.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
07/26/2023

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: CT-3 (891 pages)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 4/7/23 (clerk's only)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed on March 28, 2023 by Deborah Childers

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Imperial County Superior Court - Main; County: Imperial; Trial Court Case Number: EPR000744; Trial Court Judge: Anderholt, L.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less