This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/22/2023 at 00:16:14 (UTC).

Brandy Torrero v. Intrepid Personnel LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2023 Brandy Torrero filed an Other lawsuit against Intrepid Personnel LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Apaloo, Khymberli. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1701

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Apaloo, Khymberli

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Brandy Torrero

Respondent and Defendant

Intrepid Personnel LLC et al

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ann Hendrix

Marlies Danielle Mendoza

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Aaron Lebow

Ashton A Farr

Jeffrey Patrick Senning

Kymberleigh A Damron-Hsiao

Kevin Val Desantis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/22/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The dismissal order filed Aug 7, 2023, is vacated and the appeal is reinstated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: motion to vacate, dismissal order & default notice from superior court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: **Vacated per order of Sep 5, 2023**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: proposed order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: dtd Aug 3, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.122(c) clerk's fees not deposited. Dated:; Notes: July 18, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Jul 26, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Jul 14, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jul 6, 2023; Brandy Torrero

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: CIVSB2200228; Trial Court Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli

[+] Read More [-] Read Less