This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/19/2023 at 15:00:48 (UTC).

The People v. Lara

Case Summary

On 06/05/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Lara. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LaPorte, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6385

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

LaPorte, James

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Patrick Abenicio Lara

Not Yet Classified

Sixth District Appellate Project

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sangeeta Sinha

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Sixth District Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 12/04/2023 By 32 Day(s) 1st request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Sinha obo appellant; AOB due w/in 30 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB is due within 40 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: Master Index; R18/917 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketDescription: Probation report filed.; Notes: Vol. 1, pages 10-18, 19-36, 50-52, 60-73, 95-97, 163-164, 256-258, 385-399, 402-404

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C2/441 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 08/25/2023 By 60 Day(s) ctrr Eliason, 60 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: to ctrrs Zwetsloot, Eliason, Fike-Moes, Faccinto 6/6/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: PC 288.7(b); 4 day j/t; 15 yrs to Life CDCR; request in NOA for appointed counsel; copy to CCAP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Kings County Superior Court - Main; County: Kings; Trial Court Case Number: 21CMS0257; Trial Court Judge: LaPorte, James

[+] Read More [-] Read Less