This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/02/2023 at 04:00:21 (UTC).

O.M. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 O M filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8477

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

O. M.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

B. G.

D. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Whitney M. Kulp

Interested Party Attorneys

Kaquishka Waverly Turner

Christina Z. Beede

Ashley M. Mooney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/02/2023

DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDescription: No writ petition filed - juvenile dependency; Notes: Letter sent to counsel, petitioner and the trial court advising no petition having been filed, the case is closed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDescription: Filed scheduling order.; Notes: Petition due May 30, 2023. Preliminary response due 10 Days (PS), or 15 Days (MS/ES) thereafter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service; Notes: Supplemental proof of service to petitioner and mother's counsel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: 1 vol. electronic Clerk's Transcript (228 pp.) 9 vols. electronic Reporter's Transcript (118 pp.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 4/21/23. Record due: 5/11/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2022103; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less