This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/05/2023 at 18:12:21 (UTC).

Hart v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2023 Hart filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Falls, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7969

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Falls, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Shelly Hart

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Thomas C. Falls

Interested Parties

Courtney Sullivan

LaSalle Investment Management, Inc.

Legacy Partner's, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Court Counsel

Interested Party Attorneys

Ashan Kyle Peiris

Justin Arnold Bubion

Steven Parminter

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed April 18, 2023. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: petitioner's fee $775Petitioner's fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Fee waiver request denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: 3 volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Stay Requested.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less