This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/01/2023 at 20:00:28 (UTC).

A.A. v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 A A filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dekreon, Gail. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7794

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dekreon, Gail

 

Party Details

Petitioner

A. A.

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jaime Melquiades Longoria

Interested Party Attorney

Meredith Blagden Osborn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and request for stay are denied, for failure to provide a record sufficient to enable informed appellate review. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate and request for stay are denied, for failure to provide a record sufficient to enable informed appellate review. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b).) *tuc, fuj, pet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: THE COURT: Petitioner's request to waive court fees is granted with respect to the filing fee only, without prejudice to requiring further information if petitioner should again request a fee waiver in future filings.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: On Superior Court and the San Francisco City Attorney's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibit 1 to Petition for Writ of Mandate 4.03.2023 Court Reporter TranscriptNote: The exhibit contains confidential restraining order information.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate Immediate Stay Requested of the Hearing on Permanent Restraining Order set for May23, 2023Note: This petition discusses confidential restraining order matters, hence it is marked "Confidential."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CCH22585196; Trial Court Judge: Dekreon, Gail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less