This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/02/2023 at 02:01:45 (UTC).

Douglas v. Cantaloupe Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 Douglas filed an Other lawsuit against Cantaloupe Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8059

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Charles M. Douglas

Appellant and Defendant

The Rehabilitation Centre of Beverly Hills, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam Joshua Peck

Steven Charles Peck

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen M. Walker

Suzanne Linda Schmidt

Tracy Diana Forbath

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice dated April 25, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #404958 for $775.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on April 10, 2023 by The Rehabilitation Centre of Beverly Hills, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 22STCV00092

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less