This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/25/2023 at 11:42:03 (UTC).

Department of Children and Family Services v. A.M. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 Department of Children and Family Services filed an Other lawsuit against A M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Shapiro, Gabriela. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7711

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Shapiro, Gabriela

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Department of Children and Family Services

Defendants and Appellants

A. M.

J. E.

Not Yet Classified

E. M.

Other

Hon. Gabriela H. Shapiro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Roni Keller

Janette F. Cochran

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Mario Perez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/03/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: as to A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: as to J.E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final The appeal filed March 14, 2023 is dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal filed March 14, 2023 is dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supplemental brief received by appellant A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: No merit brief letter sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial The appeal filed March 20, 2023 is dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal filed March 20, 2023 is dismissed. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835, 838.) (As to J.E.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. M. Attorney: California Appellate Project

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. M.Attorney: California Appellate Project

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
05/22/2023

DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. E.Attorney: Janette F. Cochran

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Janette Cochran for appellant J.E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Roni Keller for appellant A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: Jasmine E. (mother)Clerk's Transcript-1 (7 pgs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcripts-2 (522 pgs) Reporter's Transcripts-2Arturo M. (father)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: notice of appeal filed 3/20/2023 - Jasmine E. (mother) re minor 19CCJP03458C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: notice of appeal filed 3/14/2023 - Arturo M. (father) re minor 19CCJP03458C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19CCJP03458C; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19CCJP03458; Trial Court Judge: Shapiro, Gabriela

[+] Read More [-] Read Less