This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/24/2023 at 20:01:21 (UTC).

Rodriguez v. Emerald Textiles Services, San Diego, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Rodriguez filed an Other lawsuit against Emerald Textiles Services, San Diego, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Caietti, Carolyn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1841

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Caietti, Carolyn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Maribel Arteaga Rodriguez

Defendant and Appellant

Emerald Textiles Services, San Diego, LLC

Other

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Lilit Ter-Astvatsatryan

Kane Moon

Jessica Marie Abreu

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

James P. Carter

Jordan Wysocki

Kathy A Le

Other Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

Office Of The District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/01/2023

DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final Upon written stipulation filed by the parties to the appeal, the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).) Each party to bear own costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Upon written stipulation filed by the parties to the appeal, the appeal is DISMISSED and the remittitur is ordered to issue immediately. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).) Each party to bear own costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: To dismiss the appeal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Emerald Textiles Services, San Diego, LLC Attorney: Jordan Wysocki AA - 1 (396 pages)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Emerald Textiles Services, San Diego, LLCAttorney: Jordan Wysocki; Notes: AA - 1 (396 pages)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: RT - 1 (11 pages)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 2/8/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 1/30/22 by Emerald Textiles Services, San Diego, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2021-00040024-CU-OE-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Caietti, Carolyn

[+] Read More [-] Read Less