This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/02/2023 at 14:16:23 (UTC).

The People v. Vasquez

Case Summary

On 06/06/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Vasquez. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodriguez, Elizabet. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6384

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rodriguez, Elizabet

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Tony Vasquez

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Scott Concklin

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 12/13/2023 By 30 Day(s) 3rd request; approved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 12/13/2023 By 30 Day(s) 3rd request; sent for approval

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 11/13/2023 By 33 Day(s) 2nd request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 10/11/2023 By 30 Day(s) 1st request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Concklin obo appellant; AOB is due within 30 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB is due within 40 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: for record filed 7/3/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: Master Index; R6/104 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Probation report filed.; Notes: Vol. 1, pages 96-98-99-123

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C1/300 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: to ctrrs McGarry, Holley, Elliott, Weymouth 6/6/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: appeals from 6/2/23 denial of petition for resentencing purs. to PC 1172.6; reques for appointed counsel in NOA; copy to CCAP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BF154379A; Trial Court Judge: Rodriguez, Elizabet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less