This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/21/2023 at 15:45:24 (UTC).

In re A.M., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 06/07/2023 In re A M , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pulos, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2274

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pulos, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

A. M.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Berta Zangari

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Beth Ploesch

Interested Party Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2023

HearingDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed June 7, 2023 by Father

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520271; Trial Court Judge: Pulos, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J520271BC; Trial Court Judge: Pulos, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less