This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/06/2023 at 13:28:59 (UTC).

The People v. Williams

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Williams. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mitchell, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8763

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mitchell, Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Anzylon Williams

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

California Appellate Project

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2023

HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcript-1 (109 pgs) Reporter's Transcript-1 Probation Report-1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: NOA filed January 12, 2023 - - Anzylon Williams

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BA212549; Trial Court Judge: Mitchell, Craig

[+] Read More [-] Read Less