This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/13/2023 at 03:29:26 (UTC).

In re R.H., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 In re R H , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cumba, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2111

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cumba, Mark

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

A. H.

Not Yet Classified

R. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Linda Rehm

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed May 11, 2023 by Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (EJ4681(B))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4681B; Trial Court Judge: Cumba, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4681; Trial Court Judge: Cumba, Mark

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less