This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/22/2023 at 06:05:12 (UTC).

Lydon v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Lydon filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1795

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Lisa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cathy Lydon

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Lisa K. Sepe-Wiesenfeld

Interested Parties

Kourosh Maddahi

Parvaz Farnad Mizrahi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Presiding Judge

Interested Party Attorneys

Brian Patrick Kamel

Yee Lam

Barton Hull Hegeler

Storm Peyton Anderson

Timothy J. Grant

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2023

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate filed on September 19, 2023 has been read and considered, along with the preliminary oppositions and reply. The petition is denied on the grounds that it fails to comply with California Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1) & (b)(3)(A), seeks untimely review of the May 24, 2023 order, and fails to establish entitlement to extraordinary relief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on September 19, 2023 has been read and considered, along with the preliminary oppositions and reply. The petition is denied on the grounds that it fails to comply with California Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1) & (b)(3)(A), seeks untimely review of the May 24, 2023 order, and fails to establish entitlement to extraordinary relief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's response to real party in interest's preliminary opposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Preliminary opposition to plaintiff's petition for writ of mandate or other relief by Real Party in Interest Parvaz Farnad Mizrahi, D.D.S.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Defendant Kourosh Maddahi, D.D.S.' preliminary opposition to plaintiff's petition for writ of mandate or other relief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: filed by petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioner regarding missing Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate/Stay requested.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less