This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/19/2023 at 07:02:42 (UTC).

Carlson v. Bird Rides, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2023 Carlson filed an Other lawsuit against Bird Rides, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clark, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6602

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Clark, Thomas

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Christopher Carlson

Appellant and Defendant

Bird Rides, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Azizi

Igor Fradkin

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Amanda Lynn Sims

April Mara Cristal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/23/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Bird Rides, Inc. Attorney: April Mara Cristal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 2V/592 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 11/22/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Christopher Carlson

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Bird Rides, Inc.Attorney: April Mara Cristal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).; Notes: Appendix and AOB due w/in 70 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDescription: Case start date.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: 8/7/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: 8/7/23; cert of mailing of Reg of Actions per CRC 8.124(a)(2)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Cristal obo Applt

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #200122 in the amount of $775.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Counsel and Superior Court: This letter is to notify you that the above-entitled case has not been selected for this court's mediation program (Local Rules, rule 2(c)). However, in accordance with this local rule, the parties may file a stipulation requesting the case be reconsidered for mediation. If a stipulation is filed, the parties will be notified promptly of the court's decision. Suspension of record preparation pursuant to local rule 2 is lifted and California Rules of Court, rules 8.121 (Notice Designating the Record on Appeal) and 8.124 (Appendixes), are reinstated as of the date of this letter. For assistance with the record preparation process please refer to the Appellate Court, Self-Help Resource Center (https://selfhelp.appellate.courts.ca.gov). Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement is due within 15 days after the superior court clerk sends notification of the filing of the notice of appeal (California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: atty Sims obo applt appeals from the order of 6/29/23 the denial of motion to compel arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BCV-22-100601; Trial Court Judge: Clark, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less