This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/27/2023 at 05:01:36 (UTC).

Sycamore Park Private Community Group v. Mountains Recreation

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 Sycamore Park Private Community Group filed an Other lawsuit against Mountains Recreation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mandel, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9585

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mandel, Elaine

 

Party Details

Appellants, Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Craig Gold

Elizabeth Stephens

Barbara Kearsley

Nino Posella

Ronald Stone

James Roberts

Kenneth Kearsley

VERMA

Sycamore Park Tennis Courts Association

ABA Protection, Inc.

Anton Belov

Not Yet Classified, Defendants and Respondents

Mountains Recreation and Conservative Authority

Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy

Sycamore Park Tennis Courts Association

ABA Protection, Inc.

Anton Belov

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Nancy B. Goldstein

Ryan C. Squire

Robert Gerald Garrett

Jennifer Renee Slater

Heather Elizabeth Stern

Michael Ian Hopkins

Robert Harwood Stellwagen, Jr.

Not Yet Classified, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Thomas R. Freeman

Angelica Ochoa

Eric F. Edmunds

Jennifer Wilcoxen Rosenfeld

Courtney Frances Writer

Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Heather Elizabeth Stern

Michael Ian Hopkins

Robert Harwood Stellwagen, Jr.

Thomas R. Freeman

Angelica Ochoa

Eric F. Edmunds

Jennifer Wilcoxen Rosenfeld

Courtney Frances Writer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2023

HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 16, 2023: (X)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 5, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated May 26, 2023: (U1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: LASC Turndown notice dated July 10, 2023. Your choice of oral record is unavailable for the proceeding date(s) of 2/15/23 because: The minute order(s) indicate that a court reporter was not present at the time of hearing or trial. Therefore, the Civil Appeals Unit will not notify any court reporter(s) to prepare transcripts.(Cross-appeal June 12, 2023)(X)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketDescription: Briefing sequence order filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDescription: Proposed briefing sequence filed by:; Notes: Stipulation re appellant briefing sequence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Exempt Gov Code 6103 (X)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross-Appeal filed June 12, 2023 by Mountains Recreation and Conservation Authority (X)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Mountains Recreation and Conservative Authority Attorney: Angelica Ochoa Attorney: Eric F. Edmunds Attorney: Thomas R. Freeman (X)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant, Cross-complainant and Respondent: Mountains Recreation and Conservative AuthorityAttorney: Angelica Ochoa Attorney: Eric F. Edmunds Attorney: Thomas R. Freeman; Notes: (X)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Craig Gold Attorney: Jennifer Renee Slater

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CIS rejected via True Filing - for X-NOA filed 6/12/2023 by Mountains Recreation; NOA has not been received or lodged in.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Craig GoldAttorney: Jennifer Renee Slater

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #158769 for $775. (U1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on May 16, 2023 by Craig Gold, et al. (U1)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SC126502; Trial Court Judge: Mandel, Elaine

[+] Read More [-] Read Less