This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/30/2023 at 03:09:40 (UTC).

KIELAR v. S.C. (HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA)

Case Summary

On 09/21/2023 KIELAR filed an Other lawsuit against C HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1937

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mark Kielar

Respondent

Superior Court of Placer County

Interested Party

Hyundai Motor America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jennifer D. Bennett

Roger Kirnos

Interested Party Attorneys

Michael C. Foley

Jason R. Litt

Eric S. Boorstin

Brian Takahashi

John A. Taylor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/25/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent requesting certification of interested parties/entities

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending consideration and disposition of a related issue in Ford Motor Warranty Cases, S279969 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Guerrero, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban, Jenkins and Evans, JJ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Hyundai Motor America Attorney: John A. Taylor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Mark Kielar Attorney: Jennifer D. Bennett

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Record requested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Hyundai Motor America Attorney: John A. Taylor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C096773; Disposition: Petition granted by opinion; Trial Court: Placer County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: SCV0048230

[+] Read More [-] Read Less