This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 20:22:59 (UTC).

The People v. Welch

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Welch. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Goul, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8175

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Goul, Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Jemar Dewayne Welch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

Stanley D. Radtke

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/06/2023

HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/06/2023 By 30 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 09/06/2023 By 30 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Stanley Radtke is appointed counsel for appellant Jamar Welch.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcripts-1 (233 pgs) Reporter's Transcript-1 Probation Report-1 *Notice sent 05/03/2023*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: NOA filed January 12, 2023 - - Jemar Dewayne Welch

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: NA099773; Trial Court Judge: Goul, Richard

[+] Read More [-] Read Less