This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/22/2023 at 05:03:08 (UTC).

The People v. McNeill

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against McNeill. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lowenthal, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8153

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lowenthal, Daniel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Jack Bruce McNeill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

William L. Heyman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/26/2023 By 20 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 09/26/2023 By 20 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/06/2023 By 30 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 09/06/2023 By 30 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 08/07/2023 By 28 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 08/07/2023 By 28 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: William Heyman appointed counsel for appellant McNeill.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: ONE: Clerk (59 Pages) *Notice sent 05/09/2023*

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: NOA filed January 12, 2023 - - Jack Bruce McNeill

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: A039828; Trial Court Judge: Lowenthal, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less