This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/26/2023 at 11:04:36 (UTC).

A.A. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 04/27/2023 A A filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8583

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Petitioner

A. A.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Party

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2023

DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketDescription: No writ petition filed - juvenile dependency; Notes: Letter sent to petitioner and the trial court advising no petition having been filed, the case is closed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Filed scheduling order.; Notes: Petition due 6/22/23. Preliminary response due 10 Days (PS), or 15 Days (MS/ES) thereafter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: 2 vols. electronic CT (575 pgs.); 29 vols. electronic RT (494 pgs.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: For statistical purposes only.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 4/27/2023. Record due 5/18/2023. (366.26)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 4/27/2023. Record due 5/18/2023. (366.28)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020184; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less