This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/13/2023 at 17:43:10 (UTC).

Simeta et al. v. Alberta Development Partners LLC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 Simeta filed an Other lawsuit against Alberta Development Partners LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosales, Olivia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7673

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosales, Olivia

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Siakimativa Simeta

Alfredo Perez

Respondent and Defendant

Alberta Development Partners LLC

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Defendants

Alberta Development Partners LLC

Alberta Tierra Luna Management, LLC

Lyle Parks, Jr. Construction

PCCP IRG Downey, LLC

IRG Downey, LLC

Cross Defendants, Not Yet Classified and Respondents

Alberta Tierra Luna Management, LLC

Lyle Parks, Jr. Construction

PCCP IRG Downey, LLC

IRG Downey, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

John Kelly Sullivan

Gabriel Luke Schaller

Jerold David Sullivan

Shea Sierra Murphy

Gilbert Perez

Respondent, Defendant, Cross Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Richard William Vanis, Jr.

Matthew Jay Eschenburg

Sondra Elizabeth Kirwan

Ayhan M Menekshe

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: [Appeal Mar 1, 2023 (R)]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondent(s) to recover costs on appeal.(Appeal Feb 28, 2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final [Appeal Mar 1, 2023 (R)]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed March 01, 2023 (R), is dismissed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated April 21, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: Clerk's notice of non-compliance dated May 16, 2023; failure to pay Reporter's Transcript fee/deposit[Appeal Mar 1, 2023 (R)]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated April 14, 2023: (R)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.100(c); Disposition Type: Partial NOA 2/28/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: (Appeal Feb 28, 2023)It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(c), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed February 28, 2023, is dismissed.CIS not filed at time of dismissal; noncompliance notice received from LASC re designation/fees.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance dated 4/27/2023; failure to designate record, pay RT fees/deposits.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Siakimativa Simeta Attorney: Shea Sierra Murphy Plaintiff and Appellant: Alfredo Perez Attorney: Shea Sierra Murphy [Appeal Mar 1, 2023 (R)]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: [Appeal March 1, 2023 (R)]$775 filing fee paid.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Siakimativa SimetaAttorney: Shea Sierra Murphy Plaintiff and Appellant: Alfredo PerezAttorney: Shea Sierra Murphy; Notes: [Appeal Mar 1, 2023 (R)]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: [Appeal March 1, 2023 (R)]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: (Appeal Feb 28, 2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Mar 1, 2023 by Siakimativa Si meta and Alfredo Perez (R)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Feb 28, 2023 by Siakimativa Simeta

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC643011; Trial Court Judge: Rosales, Olivia

[+] Read More [-] Read Less