This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/08/2023 at 01:38:45 (UTC).

In re I.P., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 In re I P , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Calero, Alexander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2140

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Calero, Alexander

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

I. D.

Not Yet Classified

I. P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • HearingDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed May 16, 2023 by Foster Mother Juvenile Fast Track Case (SJ12566(B))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SJ12566A; Trial Court Judge: Calero, Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SJ12566; Trial Court Judge: Calero, Alexander

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less