This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/13/2023 at 02:05:50 (UTC).

STEWART v. S.C. (USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY)

Case Summary

On 06/12/2023 STEWART filed an Other lawsuit against C USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0428

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph D. Stewart

Respondent

Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

USAA General Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Joshua Nathan Kastan

Jessica J. Ross

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/30/2023

DispositionDescription: Petition and Stay denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review & application for stay denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Supplemental Proof of Service reflecting Superior Court of San Diego County. Joseph D. Stewart, Petitioner Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Record requested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Joseph D. Stewart Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division One; Court of Appeal Case Number: D082122; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00011137-CU-IC-CTL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less