This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/02/2023 at 11:22:09 (UTC).

The People v. Bauman

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Bauman. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sawtelle, Ernest. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8728

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sawtelle, Ernest

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Felicia Bauman

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the State Attorney General

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Ross Thomas

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 10/23/2023 By 32 Day(s) Appellant to 10/23/23 to file appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 10/23/2023 By 32 Day(s) Appellant to 10/23/23 to file appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Ross Thomas for appellant. Appellant's opening brief due 09/21/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 Vol. CT (189 pp.); 3 Vol. Electronic RT (57 pp.); 1 Confidential Probation Report filed 01/17/23 (CT pp. 94-109). Appellant's opening brief due 08/21/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Deputy Clerk Nina Densmore to 07/03/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Deputy Clerk Nina Densmore to 07/03/23. Completed 0 of 250 total pages.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 06/02/23. Resentencing.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 18FE012890; Trial Court Judge: Sawtelle, Ernest

[+] Read More [-] Read Less