This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/29/2023 at 02:02:04 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. C.B.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against C B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8748

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

C. B.

Not Yet Classified

H. B.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Richard Lynn Knight

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Hannah Johl

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/11/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Richard L. Knight appointed for appellant. Appellant's opening brief due: 10/11/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: For appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due: 10/2/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 vol. electronic CT (217 pp.); 12 vols. electronic RT (225 pp) Appellant's opening brief due: 08/07/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 05/31/2023. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20221704; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less