This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/22/2023 at 00:26:44 (UTC).

Hatch et al. v. Cendana

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Hatch filed an Other lawsuit against Cendana. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Watkins, Shirley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7911

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Watkins, Shirley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Deborah Hatch

Caritas Home Health Providers

Unified Care Services, Inc.

Inee Cendana

Appellants and Defendants

Inee Cendana

Ruben Dalan Caguin

Other

Pamela Myers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jay Scott Stein

Joseph S. Klapach

Tracey P. Hom

Edgardo Morales Lopez

Jeremias Flores Valdez

Marlon Bradley Baldomero

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Edgardo Morales Lopez

Jeremias Flores Valdez

Marlon Bradley Baldomero

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 09/21/2023 By 76 Day(s) Court reporter Pamela Myers granted extension to September 21, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Requested for 09/21/2023 By 76 Day(s) Court reporter Pamela Myers extension request to September 21, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Caritas Home Health Providers Attorney: Tracey P. Hom Plaintiff and Appellant: Unified Care Services, Inc. Attorney: Tracey P. Hom (Appeal 03/09/2023)(R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (March 09, 2023 by Caritas Home Health Providers and Unified Care Services, Inc. (R) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Caritas Home Health ProvidersAttorney: Tracey P. Hom Plaintiff and Appellant: Unified Care Services, Inc.Attorney: Tracey P. Hom; Notes: (Appeal 03/09/2023)(R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice filed 4/14/2023 - as to appeal filed 3/9/2023 by Caritas Home Health Providers et al. appellant elects to proceed 8.124 w/o RTs *NOTE - briefing will begin once the record is filed in appeal by D. Hatch*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice filed 4/12/2023 - as to appeal filed 3/9/2023 by Deborah Hatch et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Deborah Hatch Attorney: Joseph S. Klapach (Appeal March 09, 2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney Joseph S. Klapach associated in as co-counsel of record for Deborah Hatch, Caritas Home Health Providers and Unified Care Services, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Deborah HatchAttorney: Joseph S. Klapach; Notes: (Appeal March 09, 2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (Appeal 03/09/2023)(R)Appellant's $775 filing fee paid via credit card. (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: (Appeal March 09, 2023)Appellant's $775 filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.(Appeal 03/09/2023)(R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on March 09, 2023 by Caritas Home Health Providers and Unified Care Services, Inc. (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.(Appeal March 09, 2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on March 09, 2023 by Deborah Hatch.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: LC103648; Trial Court Judge: Watkins, Shirley

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less