This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/29/2023 at 03:02:08 (UTC).

AGARDI v. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 AGARDI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9450

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Julianna Agardi

Respondent and Defendant

City & County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Hunter W. Sims

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed; Notes: Julianna Agardi, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Julianna Agardi Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A164169; Disposition: Dismissed by opinion; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20588062

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less