This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/11/2023 at 22:01:27 (UTC).

Kern County Dept. of Human Services v. C.H.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2023 Kern County Dept of Human Services filed an Other lawsuit against C H. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Norris, Christie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6356

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Norris, Christie

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Kern County Dept. of Human Services

Defendant and Appellant

C. H.

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Aida Aslanian

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court is in receipt of appellant's counsel's letter informing this court that appellant is deceased. Counsel is in the process of obtaining additional information. On this court's own motion, briefing in the above entitled matter is stayed pending a further motion by appellant's counsel.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Aplt Csl Aslanian; Notificaton - Appellant is Deceased

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: AOB due w/n 30 days - Record on Appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 2V/316 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: 5V/56 pages

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2023

DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Aslanian obo appellant C.H. - AOB due w/n 30 days from the filing of the record.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to Ctrrs Greene, Huspeth, and Holley on 6/6/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: J366; Prepared by Attorney Smith obo Appellant/Mother from the 4/18/23 order termination of parental rights. Copy to CCAP.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: JD143729-00; Trial Court Judge: Norris, Christie

[+] Read More [-] Read Less