This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/26/2023 at 07:39:13 (UTC).

URS Corporation v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 09/21/2023 URS Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rosen, Amber. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1423

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Rosen, Amber

 

Party Details

Petitioner

URS Corporation

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

Interested Parties

Charles Daniel Scrivner

Amy Scrivner

The City of Palo Alto

Anderson Pacific Engineering Construction, Inc.

AAA Fence Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steven Rob Disharoon

Interested Party Attorneys

Thomas J. Brandi

Jason B Friedman

Terence D Edwards

Syren D. Nicholas

Mark Foster Hazelwood

Jon Allen Heaberlin

Dale Long Allen, Jr

Thomas Joseph Murray

Daniel George Balich

Todd P. Drakeford

William Jr. Horsey

Christopher James Nevis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/26/2023

HearingDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and the request for stay are denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and the request for stay are denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opposition filed (due 10/2/23)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: 3 volumes of corrected exhibits

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: 8/24/23 reporter's transcript

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged***************; Notes: 3 volumes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for writ of mandate *Stay requested- Trial 3/18/24

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 18CV333834; Trial Court Judge: Rosen, Amber

[+] Read More [-] Read Less