This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/13/2023 at 21:14:43 (UTC).

Herships v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 06/07/2023 Herships filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8741

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Howard R. Herships

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

Valley Star Partners LLC, et al.

Starbucks Corporation

Cirks Construction Inc.

Mc Candless & Associates Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Charles Richard Hellstrom

Lisa Denise Nicolls

Paul D. Caleo

Athena Ariana Hernandez

Maria Amelia Caruana

Chad Steven Tapp

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/09/2023

DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: by petitioner. (S280837)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.; Notes: 1 Vol.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: GUERRERO, C.J. (Received 9/5/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed in Supreme Court.; Notes: By Petitioner (S280837).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DispositionDescription: Non-Operative Original Proceeding; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: Vexatious litigant application denied.; Notes: Petitioner's request for relief from the vexatious litigant prefiling order to permit the filing of a petition for writ of mandate is denied. Petitioner has failed to show "it appears that the litigation [the writ petition] has merit and has not been filed for the purposes of harassment or delay." (Code Civ. Proc., 391.7, subd. (b); McColm v. Westwood Park Assn. (1998) 62 Cal.App.4th 1211, 1216-1221, disapproved on other grounds by John v. Superior Court (2016) 63 Cal.4th 91.) Robie, Acting P.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2023

DocketDescription: Vexatious litigant application filed (initial case event); Notes: By petitioner.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Petitioner. Petitioner has been deemed a vexatious litigant. The petition will be dismissed unless appellant files a request for permission to petition by 06/20/23. This notice automatically stays the petition.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less