This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/12/2023 at 06:04:11 (UTC).

In re M.B., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 In re M B , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cumba, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2141

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cumba, Mark

 

Party Details

Petitioner

J. B.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Diego County

Interested Party

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Not Yet Classified

M. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Berta Zangari

Cameron A. Edwards

Interested Party Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Beth Ploesch

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/05/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final The attorney for petitioner J.B. has notified the court that a petition for writ of mandate under California Rules of Court, rule 8.452 will not be filed as there are no viable issues for writ review. Counsel's request, on petitioner's behalf, for an extension of time to file a petition is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The attorney for petitioner J.B. has notified the court that a petition for writ of mandate under California Rules of Court, rule 8.452 will not be filed as there are no viable issues for writ review. Counsel's request, on petitioner's behalf, for an extension of time to file a petition is DENIED. The case is DISMISSED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: A Notice of Intent to File Writ Petition was given in the above-entitled juvenile dependency case. In accordance with California Rules of Court, rule 8.450(g), (h) the superior court has prepared and lodged with this court the trial court record. The writ petition in this case must be filed with this court within 10 days of the date of this order (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.452(c)(1)). Any response by a real party in interest must be filed within 10 days of the filing of the writ petition, or within 15 days if the writ petition was served by mail. If the real party in interest intends not to file a response, this court should be notified in writing of such intention within the time otherwise prescribed for filing the response. Upon the filing of the response, or the receipt from the real party in interest of notification of intent not to file a response, and absent a request for oral argument, the writ petition will be deemed submitted and will be resolved by written opinion deciding the case on its merits. If either the petitioning or the responding party desires oral argument, a written request must be filed with this court within 5 days of the filing of the response. Failure to request oral argument will be deemed a waiver of the right of oral argument. If oral argument is requested, it will be scheduled within 30 days of the filing of the response unless the time is extended for exceptional good cause. If the writ petition is filed, this order constitutes an Order to Show Cause why the relief requested should not be granted. If no writ petition is filed, the case will be dismissed. In accordance with the philosophy of rules 8.450(b) and 8.452(a)(1), (h)(1), writ petitions and responses need not conform to special rules or formalities and will be liberally construed in favor of their sufficiency. The response may be in letter form. Adherence to the time provisions of the rules is required; filings not within such time strictures must include a request for waiver of the time requirement and a statement of exceptional good cause. The court reserves the power to strike any untimely filings.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: CT-1/255 pgs., RT-6/61 pgs.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed May 24, 2023 by Father

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ3980B; Trial Court Judge: Cumba, Mark

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/22/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ3980; Trial Court Judge: Cumba, Mark

[+] Read More [-] Read Less