This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/06/2023 at 11:30:42 (UTC).

Dalle-Homme v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 Dalle-Homme filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gould-Saltman, Dianna. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1787

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gould-Saltman, Dianna

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Brody Dalle-Homme

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Dianna J. Gould-Saltman

Interested Party

Joshua Homme

Others

C. H.

O. H.

W. H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Hon. Dianna J. Gould-Saltman

Interested Party Attorneys

Susan E. Wiesner

Herb Fox

Other Attorneys

Kendra Thomas

Sonia B. Dujan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/04/2023

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed September 19, 2023. The petition is denied. Petitioner's challenge to the order striking the statement of disqualification is denied as untimely. (Code Civ. Proc., 170.3, subd. (d), 1013, subd. (a)).) Petitioner fails to otherwise demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief.order sent via email and USPS mail.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Herb Fox is associated in as co-counsel of record for RPI, Joshua Homme.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate / ***STAY REQUESTED***

[+] Read More [-] Read Less