This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/13/2023 at 01:11:05 (UTC).

The People v. Guevara

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Guevara. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ryu, Tammy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8760

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ryu, Tammy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Jose Manuel Guevara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

California Appellate Project

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Jose M. Guevara was convicted by a jury of first degree residential burglary and was sentenced on March 1, 1999 to a term of imprisonment of 30 years to life. The sentence was comprised of 25 years to life pursuant to the Three Strikes law plus five years for a prior serious felony conviction. The judgment was affirmed in People v. Guevara (April 25, 2000, B130432) [nonpub. opn.] with modifications to Guevara's presentence custody credits. On October 26, 2022, Guevara filed a petition for a writ of habeas corpus on the ground that a prior conviction used pursuant to the Three Strikes law was based on a plea. The superior court denied the petition on December 16, 2022. Guevara filed a notice of appeal on January 12, 2023 from the order denying his petition. In cases not involving judgments of death (Pen. Code, 1509), "[n]o appeal lies by a defendant from an order of the superior court denying a writ of habeas corpus. . . . The attempted appeal therefrom must be dismissed." (People v. Ryan (1953) 118 Cal.App.2d 144, 149; accord, People v. Gallardo (2000) 77 Cal.App.4th 971, 983.) The appeal, initiated by the notice filed on January 12, 2023, is dismissed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: ONE: Clerk (116 Pages), ONE: reporter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Court Reporter Services regarding granted extension of time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 07/24/2023 By 143 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Requested for 07/24/2023 By 143 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: NOA filed January 12, 2023 - - Jose Manuel Guevara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: TA100162; Trial Court Judge: Ryu, Tammy

[+] Read More [-] Read Less