This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/17/2023 at 00:01:34 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. C.G.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against C G. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7945

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

C. G.

Not Yet Classified

B. G.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Saba Ahmed

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Elizabeth Wilkins Johnson

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Natalie Danielle Moore

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/18/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 vols. CT (453 pgs.), 7 vols. RT (200 pgs.). Appellant's opening brief due by: 6/27/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Elizabeth W. Johnson for Appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 2/7/23. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/27/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV202248; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less