This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/27/2023 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

N.V. v. The Superior Court; DPSS

Case Summary

On 05/19/2023 N filed an Other lawsuit against v The Superior Court DPSS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hansen, Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1363

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hansen, Kelly

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

N. V.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sophie Castillo Agopian

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Nicole Michelle Oswill

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Petitioner did not timely file a motion for relief for having failed to timely file a notice of intent, as permitted by this court's order of May 23,2023. Petition is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Counsel representing petitioner in the juvenile court proceedings may serve and file with the clerk of this court, on or before 10 days from the date of this order, a motion for relief from default in failing to timely file the notice of intent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd May 11, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Dtd May 19, 2023; N.V. (father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: SWJ1900348; Trial Court Judge: Hansen, Kelly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less