This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/18/2023 at 11:27:48 (UTC).

In re A.R., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 In re A R , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bejarano, Marissa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2230

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bejarano, Marissa

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

R. F.

Not Yet Classified

A. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/07/2023

HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DispositionDescription: Non-operative appeal; Disposition Type: Final The notice of appeal filed May 31, 2023, by non-party R.F., has been reviewed by Presiding Justice McConnell, and Associates Justices O'Rourke and Buchanan. The purported appeal is from a hearing that occurred on May 31, 2023, but no dispositional order was entered on that date and the matter was set for contested adjudication and disposition hearings on July 17, 2023, and July 18, 2023. "[T]he dispositional order is the adjudication of dependency and is the first appealable order in the dependency process." (In re Sheila B. (1993) 19 Cal.App.4th 187, 196; Welf. & Inst. Code, 395.) The appeal is premature and is therefore DISMISSED without prejudice.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The notice of appeal filed May 31, 2023, by non-party R.F., has been reviewed by Presiding Justice McConnell, and Associates Justices O'Rourke and Buchanan. The purported appeal is from a hearing that occurred on May 31, 2023, but no dispositional order was entered on that date and the matter was set for contested adjudication and disposition hearings on July 17, 2023, and July 18, 2023. "[T]he dispositional order is the adjudication of dependency and is the first appealable order in the dependency process." (In re Sheila B. (1993) 19 Cal.App.4th 187, 196; Welf. & Inst. Code, 395.) The appeal is premature and is therefore DISMISSED without prejudice.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 5/31/23 by R.F. (EJ4835)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: EJ4835; Trial Court Judge: Bejarano, Marissa

[+] Read More [-] Read Less