This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/14/2023 at 08:09:01 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. E.A.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2023 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against E A. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7973

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

E. A.

Not Yet Classified

J. G.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Natalie Danielle Moore

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due: 6/22/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, AOB due 5/30/23, RB due 30 days thereafter. Any minor's brief due 10 days after RB. ARB due 20 days after RB.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 vols. Electronic CT (498 pgs.), 14 vols. Electronic RT (260 pgs.). Appellant's opening brief due by: 5/30/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Crystal Brickner granted extension to 4/28/23. No further time will be granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Crystal Brickner requesting extension to 4/28/23. Completed 8 hours of 8 total hours.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle L. Brann on behalf of CSR Gaynell James granted extension to 3/20/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle L. Brann on behalf of CSR Gaynell James requesting extension to 3/20/23. Completed 10 hours of 15 total hours.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, record to be received by 3/2/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Minute order from Yolo County Superior Court filed 12/19/22 as to case number JV20202481 terminating parental rights.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 2/7/23. Termination of parental rights.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20202482; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20202481; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less