This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/16/2023 at 15:00:31 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. W.G.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2023 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against W G. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8797

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

W. G.

Not Yet Classified

T. G.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Kaquishka Waverly Turner

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Natalie Danielle Moore

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Record preparation inquiry follow-up due. Requested for 08/22/2023 By 61 Day(s) CSR Vanessa Murphy requesting extension to 8/22/23. Completed 0 hours of 45 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 6/2/23. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20200193; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less