This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/29/2023 at 03:16:05 (UTC).

In re N.B., a Juvenile

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 In re N B , a Juvenile was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pulos, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2165

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Pulos, Michael

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

Y. J.

Not Yet Classified

N. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Matthew Sean Harrison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023

DocketDescription: **CALENDAR NOTICE SENT** Calendar Date:; Notes: Thursday, December 14, 2023 @ 2:00 pm

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketDescription: CASE FULLY BRIEFED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: Application filed.; Notes: Appellant's request to file late OA request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: A/15 (Remote)w/request to file late

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Y. J. Attorney: Matthew Sean Harrison

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Y. J.Attorney: Matthew Sean Harrison

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 10/5

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: S.D. County Health & Human Services Agency Attorney: Office Of The County Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: S.D. County Health & Human Services AgencyAttorney: Office Of The County Counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's opposed request to augment the record on appeal filed on August 28, 2023, is treated as a request for a copy of the confidential portions of the clerk's transcript. The request is DENIED. Appellant must file a petition in the juvenile court to obtain these records. (Welf. & Inst. Code, 827; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.401(b)(2).) Respondent's Brief remains due on or before September 27, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
06/27/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On June 26, 2023, appellant filed a petition for writ of mandate and related documents in her pending appeal. The petition for writ of mandate is an original proceeding distinct from the pending appeal and was inadvertently filed under the same case number. The clerk is directed to strike the filing of the petition for writ of mandate and related documents from case number D082165 and to file the documents as an original proceeding under a new case number.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: original date exhibits to writ of mandate were filed; ordered stricken

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: original date RJN was filed in support of writ of mandate - ordered stricken

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: original date declaration was filed; ordered stricken

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: original date Writ of Mandate filed; ordered stricken

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Marisa L. Dersey Conroy

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: Clerk's-4 (916) and Reporter's-2 (31)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed by former foster parent (J519588)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: J519588; Trial Court Judge: Pulos, Michael

[+] Read More [-] Read Less