This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/14/2023 at 04:07:30 (UTC).

Solis v. Posada SL LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/21/2023 Solis filed an Other lawsuit against Posada SL LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8658

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Alicia Solis

Appellants and Defendants

Posada SL LLC

Roddy Radnia

Michael Radnia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen M. Garcia

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Lann G. McIntyre

Kathleen M. Walker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final Notice dated May 9, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice dated May 9, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #405433 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on April 21, 2023 by Posada SL LLC, Roddy Radnia and Michael Radnia.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 23NWCV00353

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less