This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 11/21/2023 at 04:09:55 (UTC).

CAPITO v. SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 CAPITO filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SAN JOSE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0018

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Taylor Capito

Respondent and Defendant

San Jose HealthCare System LP

Not Yet Classified

California Hospital Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Barry L. Kramer

Gretchen Carpenter

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Zuzana Svihra Ikels

Ariana Elizabeth Fuller

Paul R. Johnson

Amanda Louise Hayes-Kibreab

Glenn Edward Solomon

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Lowell Crozier Brown

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023

DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of respondent and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the answer brief on the merits is extended to and including November 29, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: respondent requesting extension until November 29, 2023 to file the answer brief on the merits. San Jose HealthCare System LP, Defendant and Respondent Paul R. Johnson, Retained counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketDescription: Opening brief on the merits filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Taylor Capito Attorney: Gretchen Carpenter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketBrief: Opening brief on the merits filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketDescription: Extension of time granted; Notes: On application of appellant and good cause appearing, it is ordered that the time to serve and file the opening brief on the merits is extended to and including September 25, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketDescription: Application for extension of time filed; Notes: appellant requesting an extension until September 25, 2023 to file the opening brief on the merits. by Gretchen Carpenter, counsel for appellant Taylor Capito

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDescription: Certification of interested entities or persons filed; Notes: San Jose Healthare System, LLP, Defendant and Respondent Paul John, Retained counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketDescription: Certification of interested entities or persons filed; Notes: Taylor Capito, Plaintiff and Appellant Gretchen Carpenter, Retained counsel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: grant letter and certification of interested entities sent to all parties.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; Notes: The petition for review is granted. The requests for an order directing publication of the opinion are denied. Votes: Guerrero, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban, Jenkins and Evans, JJ.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including August 14, 2023, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Taylor Capito Attorney: Gretchen Carpenter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2023

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Amended proof of service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: San Jose HealthCare System LP Attorney: Ariana Elizabeth Fuller

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDescription: Record requested

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Taylor Capito Attorney: Gretchen Carpenter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (another request pending); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Hospital Association Attorney: Lowell Crozier Brown

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: San Jose HealthCare System LP Attorney: Zuzana Svihra Ikels

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H049646; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV366981

[+] Read More [-] Read Less