This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/01/2023 at 18:07:37 (UTC).

Kern Co. Dept. of Human Services v. A.B. et al.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2023 Kern Co Dept of Human Services filed an Other lawsuit against A B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gill, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6109

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gill, Susan

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Kern Co. Dept. of Human Services

Appellants and Defendants

L. B.

J. R.

A. S.

Respondents, Defendants and Appellants

J. R.

A. S.

A. B.

E. M.

Respondents, Plaintiffs and Appellants

Kern Co. Dept. of Human Services

J. R.

A. S.

A. B.

E. M.

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the County Counsel

Shaylah Padgett-Weibel

Sean Angele Burleigh

David Morgan Yorton, Jr

Melissa Amy Chaitin

Appellant Attorney

Jamie A Moran

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Shaylah Padgett-Weibel

Sean Angele Burleigh

David Morgan Yorton, Jr

Melissa Amy Chaitin

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/10/2023 By 14 Day(s) 1st Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Order Appointing Counsel for Respondent E.M. Filed 4/25/2023 Returned by USPS on 6/5/2023. Envelope Reads: Return to Sender/No Such Number/Unable to Forward.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Order Appointing Counsel for Respondent E.M. Filed 4/25/2023 Re-Sent to Respondent at Address Provided in Returned Mail.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Order Appointing Counsel Re-sent to Respondent E.M. on 5/11/2023 Returned by USPS on 5/26/2023. Envelope Reads: Return to Sender/Not Deliverable as Addressed/Unable to Forward/Forward to 145 Niles St. Apt. B, Bakersfield, CA 93305.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Appellants' Opening Briefs Due by 6/26/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Certificate of Mailing Record on Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: R7/131 Pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C10/2889 Pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: to Respondent E.M. c/o Elizabeth Martinez at the noted address provided in the notice of appeal. Attorney Martinez confirmed the address on record for mailing is correct.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney David M. Yorton Jr. Appointed obo Respondent/Mother A.B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Jamie A. Moran Appointed obo Appellant/Minors L.B. et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed order appointing counsel (C.C.A.P. review).; Notes: Attorney Sean Angele Burleigh Appointed obo Respondent/Father A.S.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Sent to Ctrrs Cabello and Huff on 4/11/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: J300; Prepared by Attorney Trujillo for Minors: L.B. Appeals the orders of 10/3/22, 11/30/22, 01/11/23, 03/02/23 and 04/04/23. Copy to CCAP J.R. Appeals the orders of 10/3/22, 11/30/22, 01/11/23, 03/02/23 and 04/04/23. Copy to CCAP Aur.S. Appeals the orders of 10/3/22, 11/30/22, 01/11/23, 03/02/23 and 04/04/23. Copy to CCAP Aug.S. Appeals the orders of 10/3/22, 11/30/22, 01/11/23, 03/02/23 and 04/04/23. Copy to CCAP Aum.S. Appeals the orders of 10/3/22, 11/30/22, 01/11/23, 03/02/23 and 04/04/23. Copy to CCAP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: JD141596-01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: JD143815-00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: JD138698-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: JD136860-02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: JD127177-03; Trial Court Judge: Gill, Susan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less